MD HB210 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 16 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-16 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 786
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 16 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-16 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 786
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the seven elected members of the Baltimore County Board of Education to be elected in gubernatorial election years; requiring the four appointed members of the Board to be appointed in presidential election years; providing for the termination of the terms of certain appointed members of the Board in 2024; and providing for the appointment of certain members of the Board in 2028.
Title
Baltimore County - Board of Education - Member Elections and Appointments
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-04-10 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-10 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 134 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-20 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 133 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-04-10 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 134 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-20 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 133 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-16 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 786 |
2023-04-10 | House | Passed Enrolled |
2023-04-10 | House | Third Reading Passed (134-5) |
2023-04-10 | House | House Concurs Senate Amendments |
2023-04-10 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2023-04-07 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2023-04-07 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {183627/1 Adopted |
2023-04-07 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Energy, and the Environment |
2023-03-21 | Senate | Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m. |
2023-03-20 | Senate | Referred Education, Energy, and the Environment |
2023-03-20 | House | Third Reading Passed (133-0) |
2023-03-17 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2023-03-17 | House | Favorable with Amendments {463521/1 Adopted |
2023-03-17 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means |
2023-01-25 | House | Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m. |
2023-01-20 | House | First Reading Ways and Means |
Subjects
Baltimore County
Committees and Commissions
Education - Local Bills
Education, Boards of
Elections
Governor
Students
Time
Committees and Commissions
Education - Local Bills
Education, Boards of
Elections
Governor
Students
Time
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Education | 3 | 2B-01 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Education | 3 | 2B-04 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |