MD HB198 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on April 12 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-12 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on April 12 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-12 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing the Commissioner of Financial Regulation, under specified circumstances, to enter into cooperative and information-sharing agreements and to exchange information about a financial institution with any federal or state law enforcement agency and to enter into cooperative or information-sharing agreements with the Office of Foreign Assets Control; prohibiting the Commissioner from disclosing a specified record to any person requesting the record under the Maryland Freedom of Information Act; etc.
Title
Financial Institutions - Authority of Commissioner of Financial Regulation -
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2011-03-31 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-02-25 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 133 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2011-02-25 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 133 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-12 | Approved by the Governor | |
2011-03-31 | Third Reading Passed (46-0) | |
2011-03-30 | Second Reading Passed | |
2011-03-30 | Favorable Report Adopted | |
2011-04-01 | Favorable Report by Finance | |
2011-03-16 | Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2011-02-28 | First Reading Finance | |
2011-03-31 | Returned Passed | |
2011-02-25 | Third Reading Passed (133-0) | |
2011-02-23 | Second Reading Passed | |
2011-02-23 | Favorable Report Adopted | |
2011-02-22 | Favorable Report by Economic Matters | |
2011-02-02 | Hearing 2/10 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2011-01-28 | First Reading Economic Matters |
Subjects
Administrative Agencies
Disclosure
Federal Government
Financial Institutions
Financial Regulation, Division of
International Affairs
Law Enforcement
Privacy
Public Information
Records
Disclosure
Federal Government
Financial Institutions
Financial Regulation, Division of
International Affairs
Law Enforcement
Privacy
Public Information
Records