MD HB193 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Enrolled on April 8 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-04-08 - Returned Passed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on April 8 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-04-08 - Returned Passed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing Anne Arundel County and municipalities in Anne Arundel County to decrease the maximum speed limit to not less than 15 miles per hour on highways after performing an engineering and traffic investigation; and prohibiting Anne Arundel County and municipalities in Anne Arundel County from implementing a new speed monitoring system to enforce speed limits on highways on which the speed limit has been reduced under the Act.
Title
Anne Arundel County - Speed Limits - Establishment
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-18 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 129 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-08 | House | Returned Passed |
2024-04-08 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-2) |
2024-04-08 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2024-04-08 | Senate | Favorable Adopted |
2024-04-08 | Senate | Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2024-03-18 | Senate | Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m. |
2024-03-18 | Senate | Referred Judicial Proceedings |
2024-03-18 | House | Third Reading Passed (129-0) |
2024-03-15 | House | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2024-03-15 | House | Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation |
2024-02-12 | House | Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m. |
2024-01-10 | House | First Reading Environment and Transportation |
2023-11-01 | House | Pre-filed |
Subjects
Anne Arundel County
Highways
Investigations and Inquiries
Municipal Corporations
Traffic Regulation
Vehicle Laws - Rules of the Road
Highways
Investigations and Inquiries
Municipal Corporations
Traffic Regulation
Vehicle Laws - Rules of the Road
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Transportation | 21 | 801.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Transportation | 21 | 803 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |