MD HB1774 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 26 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-15 - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 26 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-15 - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing a Task Force to Study the Effectiveness of the Enforcement of Restrictions on the Possession of Regulated Firearms; providing for the membership, staffing, and duties of the Task Force; requiring the Governor to appoint the chair of the Task Force; requiring the Task Force to make recommendations regarding whether existing laws are effective and adequately serve the public and report to the Governor and General Assembly by December 1, 2018; terminating the Act after June 30, 2019; etc.
Title
Task Force to Study the Effectiveness of the Enforcement of Restrictions on the Possession of Regulated Firearms
Sponsors
Del. Carol Krimm [D] | Del. Erek Barron [D] | Del. Ana Gutierrez [D] | Sen. Michael Jackson [D] |
Del. Pat Young [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-15 | House | Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn |
2018-03-13 | House | Hearing canceled |
2018-03-14 | House | Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-03-02 | House | Rereferred to Judiciary |
2018-02-26 | House | First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations |
Subjects
Committees and Commissions
Governor
Guns
Law Enforcement
Public Safety
Reimbursement Rates
Reports
Rules and Regulations
Safety
Salaries and Compensation
Governor
Guns
Law Enforcement
Public Safety
Reimbursement Rates
Reports
Rules and Regulations
Safety
Salaries and Compensation