MD HB177 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-02-05 - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Prohibiting the Mayor and City Council of Baltimore City or the governing body of a county from increasing the county real property tax rate if the county is under a state of emergency declared by the Governor in order to protect the public health; and applying the Act to taxable years beginning after June 30, 2021.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Property Tax – Real Property Tax Rate – Prohibition on Increase During Public Health Emergency

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-05HouseWithdrawn by Sponsor
2021-01-18HouseHearing canceled
2020-12-22HouseHearing 1/19 at 1:30 p.m.
2020-10-01HousePre-filed
2021-01-13HouseFirst Reading Ways and Means

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Tax - Property6302(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback