MD HB162 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 21 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-11 - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (46-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 21 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-11 - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (46-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Altering the definition of "public record" to exclude specified documents about State employees' salaries; authorizing specified employees of the Comptroller's Office to act as police officers when enforcing specified tax laws; requiring a tax collector to impose a penalty on specified paid tax preparers not to exceed 100% of the underpayment of tax resulting from a false return filed with the intent to evade the payment of tax; etc.
Title
Comptroller - Taxpayer Protection Act
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-04-05 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-03-18 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (135-1) (Y: 135 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2016-03-18 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (135-1) (Y: 135 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-11 | Senate | Third Reading Passed with Amendments (46-0) |
2016-04-11 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2016-04-11 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {798479/1 Report Adopted |
2016-04-11 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2016-03-29 | Senate | Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m. (Judicial Proceedings) |
2016-03-21 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings and Budget and Taxation |
2016-03-21 | House | Third Reading Passed (135-1) |
2016-03-19 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2016-03-19 | House | Favorable with Amendments {962611/1 Report Adopted |
2016-03-19 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary |
2016-02-10 | House | Hearing 2/10 at 1:00 p.m. |
2016-01-22 | House | Hearing cancelled |
2016-02-09 | House | Hearing 2/09 at 1:00 p.m. |
2016-01-21 | House | First Reading Judiciary |
Subjects
Accountants
Admissions and Amusement Tax
Alcoholic Beverages
Attorney General
Buses
Chesapeake Bay
Civil Actions
Comptroller
Courts
Electronic Government
Emergencies
Estate Tax
Financial Institutions
Fraud
Fuel Tax
Income Tax
Inheritance Tax
Jurisdiction
Law Enforcement
Public Officials
Records
Recycling
Reports
Salaries and Compensation
Sales and Use Tax
Savings and Loan Associations
Sports and Recreation
State Employees
State Government - Personnel
Statutes of Limitation
Taxes - Income
Taxes - Miscellaneous
Tobacco
Transportation
Trucks
Utilities
Work, Labor and Employment
Admissions and Amusement Tax
Alcoholic Beverages
Attorney General
Buses
Chesapeake Bay
Civil Actions
Comptroller
Courts
Electronic Government
Emergencies
Estate Tax
Financial Institutions
Fraud
Fuel Tax
Income Tax
Inheritance Tax
Jurisdiction
Law Enforcement
Public Officials
Records
Recycling
Reports
Salaries and Compensation
Sales and Use Tax
Savings and Loan Associations
Sports and Recreation
State Employees
State Government - Personnel
Statutes of Limitation
Taxes - Income
Taxes - Miscellaneous
Tobacco
Transportation
Trucks
Utilities
Work, Labor and Employment