MD HB158 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-4)
Status: Passed on May 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-30 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 717
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-4)
Status: Passed on May 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-30 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 717
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Altering, for purposes of the homeowners' property tax credit, the definition of "total real property tax" to exclude any adjustments based on other property tax credits against the property tax imposed on a dwelling; requiring the State Department of Assessments and Taxation to determine whether a homeowner is owed additional homeowners' property tax credits in the form of a refund for certain taxable years as a result of the Act; requiring the Comptroller to pay a refund from the Local Reserve Account; etc.
Title
Property Tax – Homeowners’ Property Tax Credit – Calculation and Refunds
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-01 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-17 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 133 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-03-17 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 133 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-30 | House | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 717 |
2021-04-01 | House | Returned Passed |
2021-04-01 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Referred Budget and Taxation |
2021-03-17 | House | Third Reading Passed (133-0) |
2021-03-16 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2021-03-16 | House | Favorable with Amendments {205265/1 Adopted |
2021-03-15 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means |
2020-12-22 | House | Hearing 1/26 at 1:30 p.m. |
2021-01-13 | House | First Reading Ways and Means |
2020-10-12 | House | Pre-filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB593 (Crossfiled) 2021-05-30 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 718
Subjects
Appropriations
Assessments and Taxation, Department of
Comptroller
Notices
Property Tax
Tax Credits
Taxes - Property
Assessments and Taxation, Department of
Comptroller
Notices
Property Tax
Tax Credits
Taxes - Property
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Tax - Property | 9 | 104 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |