MD SB593 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-0)
Status: Enrolled on April 2 2021 - 75% progression
Action: 2021-04-02 - Returned Passed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Altering, for purposes of the homeowners' property tax credit, the definition of "total real property tax" to exclude any adjustments based on other property tax credits against the property tax imposed on a dwelling; requiring the State Department of Assessments and Taxation to determine whether a homeowner is owed additional homeowners' property tax credits in the form of a refund for certain taxable years as a result of the Act; requiring the Comptroller to pay a refund from the Local Reserve Account; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Property Tax - Homeowners' Property Tax Credit - Calculation and Refunds

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-01 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 134 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-03-02 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-02SenateReturned Passed
2021-04-01HouseThird Reading Passed (134-0)
2021-04-01HouseFavorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
2021-03-31HouseFavorable Report by Ways and Means
2021-03-20HouseHearing canceled
2021-03-08HouseHearing 3/23 at 1:30 p.m.
2021-03-03HouseReferred Ways and Means
2021-03-02SenateThird Reading Passed (47-0)
2021-02-24SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2021-02-24SenateFavorable with Amendments {409836/1 Adopted
2021-02-24SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
2021-02-02SenateHearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m.
2021-01-29SenateFirst Reading Budget and Taxation

Same As/Similar To

HB158 (Crossfiled) 2021-04-01 - Returned Passed

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Tax - Property9104(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback