MD HB1535 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 8 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-08 - Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 8 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-08 - Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing the Commission on the Commemoration of the 100th Anniversary of the Passage of the 19th Amendment to the United States Constitution; requiring the Commission to take actions and make recommendations regarding commemoration of women's suffrage in Maryland; requiring the Commission to report its findings and recommendations to the Governor and the General Assembly on or before December 31, 2014, and annually thereafter for the next 5 years; terminating the Act after October 31, 2020; etc.
Title
Commission on the Commemoration of the 100th Anniversary of the Passage of the 19th Amendment to the United States Constitution
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-04-03 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (126-0) (Y: 126 N: 0 NV: 14 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-03-18 - House - House Floor - Motion Rules Suspended for late introduction (Jones) Adopted (135-0) (Y: 135 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2013-03-18 - House - House Floor - Motion Rules Suspended for late introduction (Jones) Adopted (135-0) (Y: 135 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-08 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2013-04-08 | Senate | Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2013-04-08 | Senate | First Reading Senate Rules |
2013-04-08 | House | Third Reading Passed (126-0) |
2013-04-08 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2013-04-08 | House | Favorable with Amendments {126384/1 Report Adopted |
2013-04-08 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations |
2013-04-03 | House | Hearing 4/03 at 1:00 p.m. |
2013-03-22 | House | Rereferred to Health and Government Operations |
2013-03-21 | House | Referred House Rules and Executive Nominations |
2013-03-21 | House | Motion Rules Suspended for late introduction (Delegate Jones) Adopted (135-0) |
2013-03-18 | House | First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations |
Subjects
Administrative Agencies
Archives
Committees and Commissions
Constitution, U.S.
Historical Matters
Holidays and Special Dates
Reports
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials
Sunset
Voting
Women
Archives
Committees and Commissions
Constitution, U.S.
Historical Matters
Holidays and Special Dates
Reports
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials
Sunset
Voting
Women