MD HB1517 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Vetoed on May 26 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-01-10 - Veto sustained (0-140)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on May 26 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-01-10 - Veto sustained (0-140)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Renaming the Maryland Not-For-Profit Development Center Program and the Maryland Not-For-Profit Development Center Program Fund to be the Maryland Nonprofit Development Center Program and the Maryland Nonprofit Development Center Program Fund; establishing the Nonprofit, Interest-Free, Micro Bridge Loan (NIMBL) Account within the Fund; authorizing the Governor to transfer specified funds by June 30, 2017, to the NIMBL Account; requiring the Department of Commerce to submit a specified report on the bridge loans by December 31, 2020; etc.
Title
Maryland Nonprofit Development Center Program and Fund - Bridge Loans
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-03 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (87-49) (Y: 87 N: 49 NV: 4 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-02 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-16 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (92-47) (Y: 92 N: 47 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-04-02 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-16 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (92-47) (Y: 92 N: 47 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-10 | House | Veto sustained (0-140) |
2017-05-26 | House | Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative) |
2017-04-10 | House | Passed Enrolled |
2017-04-10 | House | Third Reading Passed (87-49) |
2017-04-10 | House | House Concur - Senate Amendments |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Third Reading Passed with Amendments (46-0) |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Floor Amendment {943628/1 (Senator Kagan) Adopted |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {697975/1 Report Adopted |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance |
2018-03-29 | Senate | Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-03-20 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
2017-03-20 | House | Third Reading Passed (92-47) |
2017-03-18 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2017-03-18 | House | Favorable with Amendments {183394/1 Report Adopted |
2017-03-18 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters |
2018-03-15 | House | Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-02-10 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |
Subjects
Commerce, Department of
Comptroller
Debt Management
Economic and Community Development
Equipment
Gaming
General Assembly
Governor
Interest
Loans
Lottery
Minorities
Nonprofit Organizations
Notices
Reports
Revenue and Taxes
Small Business
Video
Women
Comptroller
Debt Management
Economic and Community Development
Equipment
Gaming
General Assembly
Governor
Interest
Loans
Lottery
Minorities
Nonprofit Organizations
Notices
Reports
Revenue and Taxes
Small Business
Video
Women