MD HB151 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB353
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-07 - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-07 - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing the use of traffic control device monitoring systems, devices designed to capture a recorded image of a violation, by State and local agencies, if authorized by local law; providing that the owner or driver of a motor vehicle recorded failing to obey a traffic control device is subject under certain circumstances to a citation and civil penalty not exceeding $40; establishing certain defenses to a charge of an alleged violation recorded by a traffic control device monitoring system; etc.
Title
Traffic Control Device Monitoring Systems - Authorization
Sponsors
Del. Anne Healey [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-07 | House | Withdrawn by Sponsor |
2022-01-10 | House | Hearing 1/27 at 1:00 p.m. |
2022-01-12 | House | First Reading Environment and Transportation |
2021-11-01 | House | Pre-filed |
Same As/Similar To
HB151 (Carry Over) 2022-03-07 - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Subjects
Administrative Agencies
Certifications
Citations
Civil Actions
Clerks of Court
Communications
Counties
Courts
Crimes and Punishments
District Courts
Electronic Surveillance
Evidence
Fees
Forms
Hearings
Highways
Jurisdiction
Law Enforcement
Laws and Ordinances
Motor Vehicle Operation
Motor Vehicle Registration
Municipal Corporations
Notices
Open Government
Penalties and Sentences
Photography
Recordings
Records
Signatures
Signs and Billboards
State Highway Administration
Traffic Regulation
Transportation
Vehicle Laws - Rules of the Road
Video
Certifications
Citations
Civil Actions
Clerks of Court
Communications
Counties
Courts
Crimes and Punishments
District Courts
Electronic Surveillance
Evidence
Fees
Forms
Hearings
Highways
Jurisdiction
Law Enforcement
Laws and Ordinances
Motor Vehicle Operation
Motor Vehicle Registration
Municipal Corporations
Notices
Open Government
Penalties and Sentences
Photography
Recordings
Records
Signatures
Signs and Billboards
State Highway Administration
Traffic Regulation
Transportation
Vehicle Laws - Rules of the Road
Video
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Courts and Judicial Proceedings | 10 | 311 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Courts and Judicial Proceedings | 4 | 401 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Courts and Judicial Proceedings | 7 | 302 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Transportation | 21 | 201 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Transportation | 21 | 201.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |