MD HB15 | 2023 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB461
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-01-16 - Hearing 2/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-01-16 - Hearing 2/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Increasing the amount of certain subtraction modifications under the Maryland income tax for individuals who are at least 55 years of age for certain retirement income received as a result of the individual's military service or attributable to the individual's employment as a correctional officer, a law enforcement officer, or a fire, rescue, or emergency services personnel; etc.
Title
Income Tax Subtraction Modification - Military and Public Safety Retirement Income
Sponsors
Del. Mike Rogers [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-01-16 | House | Hearing 2/02 at 1:00 p.m. |
2023-01-11 | House | First Reading Ways and Means |
2022-11-18 | House | Pre-filed |
Same As/Similar To
HB461 (Carry Over) 2022-01-27 - Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m.
SB83 (Crossfiled) 2023-01-10 - Hearing 1/19 at 1:00 p.m.
SB83 (Crossfiled) 2023-01-10 - Hearing 1/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Subjects
Age
Armed Forces
Correctional Officers
Emergency Medical Services
Exemptions
Fire Protection
Income Tax
Law Enforcement
Rescue Squads
Retirement
Taxes - Income
Veterans
Armed Forces
Correctional Officers
Emergency Medical Services
Exemptions
Fire Protection
Income Tax
Law Enforcement
Rescue Squads
Retirement
Taxes - Income
Veterans
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Tax - General | 10 | 207 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Maryland State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Legislation/Details/HB0015?ys=2023RS |
Text | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2023RS/bills/hb/hb0015f.pdf |