MD HB461 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB15
Note: Carry Over of previous HB951
Note: Carry Over of previous HB951
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-6)
Status: Introduced on January 21 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-27 - Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 21 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-27 - Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Increasing from $15,000 to $20,000 the amount of certain subtraction modifications under the Maryland income tax for individuals who are at least 55 years of age for certain retirement income received as a result of the individual's military service or attributable to the individual's employment as a correctional officer, a law enforcement officer, or a fire, rescue, or emergency services personnel.
Title
Income Tax Subtraction Modification - Military and Public Safety Retirement Income
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-27 | House | Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m. |
2022-01-21 | House | First Reading Ways and Means |
Same As/Similar To
HB461 (Carry Over) 2022-01-27 - Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m.
SB130 (Crossfiled) 2022-03-29 - Referred Rules and Executive Nominations
HB951 (Carry Over) 2021-02-02 - Hearing 2/18 at 1:30 p.m.
SB130 (Crossfiled) 2022-03-29 - Referred Rules and Executive Nominations
HB951 (Carry Over) 2021-02-02 - Hearing 2/18 at 1:30 p.m.
Subjects
Armed Forces
Correctional Officers
Emergency Medical Services
Emergency Services
Exemptions
Fire Protection
Income Tax
Law Enforcement
Rescue Squads
Retirement
Taxes - Income
Veterans
Correctional Officers
Emergency Medical Services
Emergency Services
Exemptions
Fire Protection
Income Tax
Law Enforcement
Rescue Squads
Retirement
Taxes - Income
Veterans
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Tax - General | 10 | 207 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Tax - General | 10 | 209 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Maryland State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Legislation/Details/HB0461?ys=2022RS |
Text | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2022RS/bills/hb/hb0461f.pdf |