MD SB83 | 2023 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB130
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-01-10 - Hearing 1/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Budget and Taxation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-01-10 - Hearing 1/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Budget and Taxation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Increasing the amount of certain subtraction modifications under the Maryland income tax for individuals who are at least 55 years of age for certain retirement income received as a result of the individual's military service or attributable to the individual's employment as a correctional officer, a law enforcement officer, or a fire, rescue, or emergency services personnel.
Title
Income Tax Subtraction Modification – Military and Public Safety Retirement Income
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-01-10 | Senate | Hearing 1/19 at 1:00 p.m. |
2023-01-11 | Senate | First Reading Budget and Taxation |
2022-11-16 | Senate | Pre-filed |
Same As/Similar To
HB15 (Crossfiled) 2023-01-16 - Hearing 2/02 at 1:00 p.m.
SB130 (Carry Over) 2022-03-29 - Referred Rules and Executive Nominations
SB130 (Carry Over) 2022-03-29 - Referred Rules and Executive Nominations
Subjects
Age
Armed Forces
Correctional Officers
Emergency Medical Services
Exemptions
Fire Protection
Income Tax
Law Enforcement
Rescue Squads
Retirement
Taxes - Income
Veterans
Armed Forces
Correctional Officers
Emergency Medical Services
Exemptions
Fire Protection
Income Tax
Law Enforcement
Rescue Squads
Retirement
Taxes - Income
Veterans
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Tax - General | 10 | 207 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Maryland State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Legislation/Details/SB0083?ys=2023RS |
Text | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2023RS/bills/sb/sb0083f.pdf |