MD HB1498 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 27 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-27 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 851
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 27 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-27 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 851
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing a political action committee to establish one compliance account; providing that disbursements from a political action committee compliance account may be made only for purposes of complying with specified campaign finance laws; providing that donations to a political action committee compliance account may be made only if the donor consents to the use of the donation for specified purposes; providing that donations to a political action committee compliance account are not subject to specified limits; etc.
Title
Campaign Finance - Political Organizations - Compliance and Disclosure
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-01 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (87-48) (Y: 87 N: 48 NV: 3 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-04-01 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (34-12) (Y: 34 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-14 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (89-50) (Y: 89 N: 50 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-01 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (34-12) (Y: 34 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-14 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (89-50) (Y: 89 N: 50 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-27 | House | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 851 |
2017-04-08 | House | Passed Enrolled |
2017-04-08 | House | Third Reading Passed (87-48) |
2017-04-08 | House | House Concur - Senate Amendments |
2017-04-07 | Senate | Third Reading Passed with Amendments (34-12) |
2017-04-07 | Senate | Floor Amendment {923127/1 (Senator Pinsky) Adopted |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {194838/1 Report Adopted |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-03-20 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2017-03-17 | House | Third Reading Passed (89-50) |
2017-03-16 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2017-03-16 | House | Favorable with Amendments {375266/1 Report Adopted |
2017-03-16 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means |
2017-03-02 | House | Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-02-10 | House | First Reading Ways and Means |
Subjects
Campaign Financing
Communications
Disclosure
Elections
Elections, State Board of
Gifts
Liability
Penalties and Sentences
Political Committees
Political Parties
Reports
Rules and Regulations
Communications
Disclosure
Elections
Elections, State Board of
Gifts
Liability
Penalties and Sentences
Political Committees
Political Parties
Reports
Rules and Regulations