MD HB1482 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 11-0)
Status: Passed on April 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-10 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 78
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 11-0)
Status: Passed on April 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-10 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 78
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing any adult family member of a disabled real estate broker to carry on the business of the disabled broker for 6 months for certain purposes subject to certain qualifications; requiring certain family members to surrender a certain certificate and pocket card and submit certain information to the State Real Estate Commission under certain circumstances; defining "disability" as a total and permanent disability that renders a broker unable to perform real estate brokerage services; etc.
Title
State Real Estate Commission – Brokers – Business Succession in the Event of Disability
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-28 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-12 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (136-0) (Y: 137 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2018-03-12 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (136-0) (Y: 137 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 10) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-10 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 78 |
2018-04-03 | House | Returned Passed |
2018-04-02 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2018-03-30 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2018-03-30 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2018-03-30 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2018-03-16 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2018-03-15 | House | Third Reading Passed (136-0) |
2018-03-14 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2018-03-14 | House | Favorable with Amendments {943090/1 Report Adopted |
2018-03-14 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters |
2018-03-09 | House | Hearing 3/09 at 2:30 p.m. |
2018-03-06 | House | Hearing canceled |
2018-03-09 | House | Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-02-09 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |
Subjects
Agents and Brokers
Business Regulation and Occupations
Committees and Commissions
Disabilities
Licenses
Real Estate
Time
Business Regulation and Occupations
Committees and Commissions
Disabilities
Licenses
Real Estate
Time