MD HB1459 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-10 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 118
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-10 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 118
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring funds in the Calvert County Youth Recreational Opportunities Fund first to be used for the sole purpose of completing the development of Ward Farm Recreation and Nature Park until the development of the park is complete; requiring the Calvert County Board of County Commissioners to adopt a certain plan after the development of Ward Farm Recreation and Nature Park is complete; altering the distribution of revenue from the State's admissions and amusement tax on electronic bingo and electronic tip jars; etc.
Title
Calvert County – Youth Recreational Opportunities Fund and Distribution From Admissions and Amusement Tax Revenues
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-26 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 46 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-03-15 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (138-0) (Y: 139 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-03-15 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (138-0) (Y: 139 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-10 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 118 |
2018-03-30 | House | Returned Passed |
2018-03-29 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2018-03-28 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2018-03-28 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2018-03-28 | Senate | Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation |
2018-03-27 | Senate | Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-03-19 | Senate | First Reading Budget and Taxation |
2018-03-19 | House | Third Reading Passed (138-0) |
2018-03-17 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2018-03-17 | House | Favorable with Amendments {830416/1 Report Adopted |
2018-03-17 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation |
2018-03-13 | House | Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-02-09 | House | First Reading Environment and Transportation |
Subjects
Bingo
Calvert County
Counties - Generally
County Commissioners
Forests and Parks
Gaming
Reports
Revenue and Taxes
Sports and Recreation
Taxes - Miscellaneous
Youth
Calvert County
Counties - Generally
County Commissioners
Forests and Parks
Gaming
Reports
Revenue and Taxes
Sports and Recreation
Taxes - Miscellaneous
Youth