MD HB1455 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 2 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-02 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 2 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-02 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Extending the termination date of specified provisions of law requiring the Mortality and Quality Review Committee to make specified reports, recommendations and findings regarding incidents of injury and requiring the Office of Health Care Quality to provide specified data to the Committee.
Title
Mortality and Quality Review Committee - Reporting Requirements - Sunset
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-03-30 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-03-21 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 130 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2012-03-07 - House - Motion Rules Suspended for late introduction (Costa) Adopted (Y: 139 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-03-21 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 130 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2012-03-07 - House - Motion Rules Suspended for late introduction (Costa) Adopted (Y: 139 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-02 | Approved by the Governor | |
2012-03-30 | Third Reading Passed (46-0) | |
2012-03-29 | Second Reading Passed | |
2012-03-29 | Favorable Report Adopted | |
2012-04-04 | Favorable Report by Finance | |
2012-03-27 | Hearing 4/3 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2012-03-22 | First Reading Finance | |
2012-04-01 | Returned Passed | |
2012-03-21 | Third Reading Passed (130-0) | |
2012-03-20 | Second Reading Passed | |
2012-03-20 | Favorable Report Adopted | |
2012-03-22 | Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations | |
2012-03-14 | Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2012-03-09 | Re-referred Health and Government Operations | |
2012-03-07 | Referred House Rules and Executive Nominations | |
2012-03-07 | Motion Rules Suspended for late introduction (Delegate Costa) Adopted (139-0) | |
2012-03-07 | First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations |
Subjects
Accidents
Administrative Agencies
Committees and Commissions
Community Facilities and Services
Death
Developmental Disabilities
Group Homes
Health
Patients
Reports
Safety
Sunset
Administrative Agencies
Committees and Commissions
Community Facilities and Services
Death
Developmental Disabilities
Group Homes
Health
Patients
Reports
Safety
Sunset