MD HB1451 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 12 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-19 - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 12 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-19 - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Altering a specified exemption from registration as a debt settlement services provider; altering the debt settlement services fee that a registrant may charge; and repealing a specified reporting requirement for a registrant.
Title
Commercial Law - Debt Settlement Services - Miscellaneous Provisions
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-19 | House | Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters |
2016-03-09 | House | Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m. |
2016-02-15 | House | Hearing cancelled |
2016-03-15 | House | Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m. |
2016-02-12 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |
Subjects
Attorneys
Commercial Law - Consumer Protection
Commercial Law - Credit Regulation
Debt Management
Fees
Financial Institutions
Financial Regulation, Division of
Registration
Reports
Commercial Law - Consumer Protection
Commercial Law - Credit Regulation
Debt Management
Fees
Financial Institutions
Financial Regulation, Division of
Registration
Reports