MD HB145 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Vetoed on May 27 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-27 - Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on May 27 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-27 - Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing the Commissioner of Labor and Industry to issue a stop work order for each work site where the Commissioner has made an initial determination that a contractor or subcontractor may have violated the prevailing wage requirements; requiring a prompt investigation of compliance with certain wage requirements if a complaint of a violation is received or a violation is made known; authorizing the Commission to impose a penalty of up to $5,000 for each day a stop work order is violated; etc.
Title
State Finance and Procurement - Prevailing Wage - Stop Work Orders
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-01 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 96 N: 36 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2022-03-31 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 32 N: 14 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-18 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 94 N: 37 NV: 1 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2022-03-31 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 32 N: 14 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-18 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 94 N: 37 NV: 1 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-27 | House | Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative) |
2022-04-01 | House | Passed Enrolled |
2022-04-01 | House | Third Reading Passed (96-36) |
2022-04-01 | House | House Concurs Senate Amendments |
2022-03-31 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (32-14) |
2022-03-31 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2022-03-31 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {623423/1 Adopted |
2022-03-30 | Senate | Motion Laid Over (Senator Reilly) Adopted |
2022-03-30 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {623423/1 |
2022-03-30 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance |
2022-03-21 | Senate | Referred Finance |
2022-03-18 | House | Third Reading Passed (94-37) |
2022-03-17 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2022-03-17 | House | Favorable with Amendments {433227/1 Adopted |
2022-03-17 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters |
2022-01-13 | House | Hearing 1/25 at 1:00 p.m. |
2022-01-12 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |
2021-10-06 | House | Pre-filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB1 (Crossfiled) 2022-04-09 - Gubernatorial Veto Override (Legislative date: 4/8/2022) - Chapter 49
Subjects
Agents and Brokers
Appeals
Civil Actions
Committees and Commissions
Communications
Contractors
Contracts
Crimes and Punishments
Fines
Hearings
Investigations and Inquiries
Jurisdiction
Labor and Industry, Division of
Liability
Penalties and Sentences
Procurement
Records
Reports
Revenue and Taxes
Salaries and Compensation
State Government - Procurement
Time
Work, Labor, and Employment
Appeals
Civil Actions
Committees and Commissions
Communications
Contractors
Contracts
Crimes and Punishments
Fines
Hearings
Investigations and Inquiries
Jurisdiction
Labor and Industry, Division of
Liability
Penalties and Sentences
Procurement
Records
Reports
Revenue and Taxes
Salaries and Compensation
State Government - Procurement
Time
Work, Labor, and Employment
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
State Finance and Procurement | 17 | 201 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
State Finance and Procurement | 17 | 221 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |