MD SB1 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on April 9 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-09 - Gubernatorial Veto Override (Legislative date: 4/8/2022) - Chapter 49
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on April 9 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-09 - Gubernatorial Veto Override (Legislative date: 4/8/2022) - Chapter 49
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing the Commissioner of Labor and Industry to issue a stop work order for each work site where the Commissioner has made an initial determination that a contractor or subcontractor may have violated the prevailing wage requirements; requiring a prompt investigation of compliance with certain wage requirements if a complaint of a violation is received or a violation is made known; authorizing the Commissioner to impose a penalty of up to $5,000 for each day a stop work order is violated; etc.
Title
State Finance and Procurement – Prevailing Wage – Stop Work Orders
Sponsors
Sen. Pamela Beidle [D] | Sen. Malcolm Augustine [D] | Sen. Brian Feldman [D] | Sen. Delores Kelley [D] |
Sen. Benjamin Kramer [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-04-09 - Senate - Overridden (Y: 31 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-04-09 - House - Overridden (Y: 97 N: 41 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-04-01 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 31 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-31 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 93 N: 34 NV: 2 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2022-03-10 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 32 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-09 - House - Overridden (Y: 97 N: 41 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-04-01 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 31 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-31 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 93 N: 34 NV: 2 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2022-03-10 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 32 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-09 | House | Gubernatorial Veto Override (Legislative date: 4/8/2022) - Chapter 49 |
2022-04-09 | House | Overridden (97-41) |
2022-04-09 | Senate | Overridden (31-15) |
2022-04-08 | Senate | Vetoed by the Governor (Policy) |
2022-04-01 | Senate | Passed Enrolled |
2022-04-01 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (31-15) |
2022-04-01 | Senate | Senate Concurs House Amendments |
2022-03-31 | House | Third Reading Passed (93-34) |
2022-03-31 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2022-03-31 | House | Favorable with Amendments {703428/1 Adopted |
2022-03-31 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters |
2022-03-11 | House | Referred Economic Matters |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (32-15) |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {493721/1 Adopted |
2022-03-07 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance |
2022-01-20 | Senate | Hearing 2/10 at 1:00 p.m. |
2022-01-12 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
2021-09-24 | Senate | Pre-filed |
Same As/Similar To
HB145 (Crossfiled) 2022-05-27 - Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Subjects
Agents and Brokers
Appeals
Civil Actions
Committees and Commissions
Communications
Contractors
Contracts
Crimes and Punishments
Fines
Hearings
Investigations and Inquiries
Jurisdiction
Labor and Industry, Division of
Liability
Penalties and Sentences
Procurement
Records
Reports
Revenue and Taxes
Salaries and Compensation
State Government - Procurement
Time
Work, Labor, and Employment
Appeals
Civil Actions
Committees and Commissions
Communications
Contractors
Contracts
Crimes and Punishments
Fines
Hearings
Investigations and Inquiries
Jurisdiction
Labor and Industry, Division of
Liability
Penalties and Sentences
Procurement
Records
Reports
Revenue and Taxes
Salaries and Compensation
State Government - Procurement
Time
Work, Labor, and Employment
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
State Finance and Procurement | 17 | 201 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
State Finance and Procurement | 17 | 221 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |