MD HB1446 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Passed on May 25 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-25 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 635
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Passed on May 25 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-25 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 635
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Clarifying that the requirement that a State or State aided or controlled entity include in specified maintenance contracts from Blind Industries and Services of Maryland applies to products made, manufactured, remanufactured, or assembled by Blind Industries and Services of Maryland.
Title
Procurement Preferences - Blind Industries and Services of Maryland - Janitorial Products
Sponsors
Sen. Antonio Hayes [D] | Del. Angela Angel [D] | Del. Eric Bromwell [D] | Del. Susan Krebs [R] |
Del. Matt Morgan [R] | Del. Dan Morhaim [D] | Del. Andrew Platt [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-03-30 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-30 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (139-0) (Y: 139 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-03-12 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (139-0) (Y: 139 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-30 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (139-0) (Y: 139 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-03-12 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (139-0) (Y: 139 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-25 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 635 |
2017-04-06 | House | Passed Enrolled |
2017-04-06 | House | Third Reading Passed (139-0) |
2017-04-06 | House | House Concur - Senate Amendments |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Third Reading Passed with Amendments (47-0) |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {574335/1 Report Adopted |
2017-04-03 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2017-03-16 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2017-03-15 | House | Third Reading Passed (139-0) |
2017-03-14 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2017-03-14 | House | Favorable with Amendments {526180/1 Report Adopted |
2017-03-13 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations |
2017-03-01 | House | Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-02-10 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations |
Subjects
Administrative Agencies
Blind Persons
Committees and Commissions
Community Facilities and Services
Contractors
Developmental Disabilities
Disabilities
Industry and Technology
Prices
Procurement
State Government - Procurement
Vocational Rehabilitation
Blind Persons
Committees and Commissions
Community Facilities and Services
Contractors
Developmental Disabilities
Disabilities
Industry and Technology
Prices
Procurement
State Government - Procurement
Vocational Rehabilitation