MD HB1441 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-0)
Status: Passed on April 25 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-25 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 165
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-0)
Status: Passed on April 25 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-25 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 165
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Altering staff qualifications in eligible prekindergarten programs; authorizing a county board to apply for funding to lease space for prekindergarten programs; establishing an early childhood educator career ladder; requiring the Department of Education to establish prekindergarten provider hubs; requiring the Department to distribute a list of eligible private prekindergarten providers; requiring the Governor to appropriate in fiscal year 2026 an amount that is at least equal to the amount appropriated in fiscal year 2024; etc.
Title
Early Childhood Education - Publicly Funded Prekindergarten Programs - Alterations
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-08 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 122 N: 15 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-04-08 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 40 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-18 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 128 N: 12 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-08 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 40 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-18 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 128 N: 12 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-25 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 165 |
2024-04-08 | House | Passed Enrolled |
2024-04-08 | House | Third Reading Passed (122-15) |
2024-04-08 | House | House Concurs Senate Amendments |
2024-04-08 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (40-7) |
2024-04-06 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2024-04-06 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {463720/1 Adopted |
2024-04-06 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Energy, and the Environment |
2024-03-19 | Senate | Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m. (Education, Energy, and the Environment) |
2024-03-18 | Senate | Referred Education, Energy, and the Environment Budget and Taxation |
2024-03-18 | House | Third Reading Passed (128-12) |
2024-03-16 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2024-03-16 | House | Favorable with Amendments {743023/1 Adopted |
2024-03-16 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means |
2024-02-09 | House | Hearing 2/26 at 11:00 a.m. (Ways and Means) |
2024-02-09 | House | First Reading Ways and Means and Appropriations |
Subjects
Appropriations
Awareness and Outreach
Building Maintenance and Repair
Certifications
Child Care
Continuing Education
Counties
Education
Education - Miscellaneous
Education, Boards of
Education, State Department of
Grants
Higher Education
Job Training
Language
Leases and Rent
Mentors
Minors
Notices
Parents and Guardians
Primary and Secondary Education
Private Schools
Public Schools
Revenue and Taxes
Salaries and Compensation
Standards and Best Practices
Teachers
Waivers
Work, Labor, and Employment
Awareness and Outreach
Building Maintenance and Repair
Certifications
Child Care
Continuing Education
Counties
Education
Education - Miscellaneous
Education, Boards of
Education, State Department of
Grants
Higher Education
Job Training
Language
Leases and Rent
Mentors
Minors
Notices
Parents and Guardians
Primary and Secondary Education
Private Schools
Public Schools
Revenue and Taxes
Salaries and Compensation
Standards and Best Practices
Teachers
Waivers
Work, Labor, and Employment
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Education | 5 | 904 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Education | 5 | 905 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Education | 7 | 101.2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Education | 7 | 1A-01 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Education | 7 | 1A-03 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Education | 7 | 1A-04 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Education | 7 | 1A-05 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Education | 7 | 1A-07 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Education | 7 | 1A-08 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Education | 7 | 1A-09 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |