MD HB1418 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 20 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-30 - Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Judicial Proceedings Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 20 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-30 - Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Judicial Proceedings Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring a specified designee who may conduct a specified assessment to be certified or licensed, rather than certified and licensed; authorizing a person serving a specified term of confinement for an offense relating to volume dealing in cocaine base imposed on or before September 30, 2017, to file a motion to modify or reduce the sentence under specified circumstances; altering the membership of the Justice Reinvestment Oversight Board; etc.
Title
Justice Reinvestment Act - Modifications
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-17 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (117-23) (Y: 117 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-30 | Senate | Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-03-20 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
2017-03-20 | House | Third Reading Passed (117-23) |
2017-03-20 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2017-03-20 | House | Favorable with Amendments {872517/1 Report Adopted |
2017-03-20 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary |
2017-03-10 | House | Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m. (Judiciary) |
2017-02-10 | House | First Reading Judiciary and Health and Government Operations |
Subjects
Committees and Commissions
Controlled Dangerous Substances
Courts
Criminal Law - Procedure
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes
Elderly Persons
Fines
Hearings
Licenses
Parole and Probation
Penalties and Sentences
Petitions
Public Safety
Sexual Offenses
Controlled Dangerous Substances
Courts
Criminal Law - Procedure
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes
Elderly Persons
Fines
Hearings
Licenses
Parole and Probation
Penalties and Sentences
Petitions
Public Safety
Sexual Offenses