MD HB1392 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 24 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-21 - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 24 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-21 - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Repealing the limitation on the period of time during which the Department of the Environment is required to assist specified homeowners by paying a specified cost difference between a conventional on-site sewage disposal system and a system that utilizes nitrogen removal technology.
Title
On-Site Sewage Disposal System - Nitrogen Removal Technology - Homeowner
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-21 | Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters Withdrawn | |
2012-03-15 | Hearing cancelled | |
2012-03-06 | Hearing 3/16 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2012-03-05 | Re-referred Environmental Matters | |
2012-02-24 | First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations |
Subjects
Maryland State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Search/Legislation?target=/2012rs/billfile/HB1392.htm |
Text | http://mlis.state.md.us/2012rs/bills/hb/hb1392f.pdf |