MD HB1385 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 15 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-15 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 641
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 15 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-15 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 641
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing the Mayor and City Council of Baltimore to establish by ordinance a certain Tourism Improvement District; authorizing the Mayor and City Council to designate a Tourism Improvement District Association to provide certain services; requiring the Association to establish a certain financial plan for the District; prohibiting the Mayor and City Council from authorizing certain reductions in certain existing funding; providing that certain unspent funds be refunded to certain business owners in a certain manner; etc.
Title
Baltimore City - Tourism Improvement District
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-01 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (42-0) (Y: 43 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-03-15 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (137-0) (Y: 138 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-03-15 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (137-0) (Y: 138 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-15 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 641 |
2018-04-06 | House | Returned Passed |
2018-04-06 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (42-0) |
2018-04-05 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2018-04-05 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2018-04-04 | Senate | Favorable Report by Finance |
2018-04-03 | Senate | Hearing 4/03 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-03-19 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
2018-03-19 | House | Third Reading Passed (137-0) |
2018-03-17 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2018-03-17 | House | Favorable with Amendments {690719/1 Report Adopted |
2018-03-16 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation |
2018-03-13 | House | Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-02-09 | House | First Reading Environment and Transportation |
Subjects
Baltimore City
Budgets
Commerce and Business
Committees and Commissions
Counties - Local Laws
Hearings
Laws and Ordinances
Minorities
News Media
Nonprofit Organizations
Notices
Revenue and Taxes
Tourism
Women
Budgets
Commerce and Business
Committees and Commissions
Counties - Local Laws
Hearings
Laws and Ordinances
Minorities
News Media
Nonprofit Organizations
Notices
Revenue and Taxes
Tourism
Women