MD HB138 | 2021 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous HB575

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-01-21 - Hearing 2/03 at 1:30 p.m.
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring the State Board of Education and certain nonpublic schools to develop and implement a program of age-appropriate education on the awareness and prevention of sexual abuse and assault that includes, for students in grades 6 through 8, material promoting the awareness and prevention of human and sex trafficking.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Education - Sexual Abuse and Assault Awareness and Prevention Program - Human and Sex Trafficking

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-01-21HouseHearing 2/03 at 1:30 p.m.
2021-01-13HouseFirst Reading Ways and Means
2020-10-22HousePre-filed

Same As/Similar To

HB575 (Carry Over) 2020-02-04 - Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback