MD HB1360 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-10)
Status: Vetoed on May 26 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-01-10 - Veto sustained (0-140)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on May 26 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-01-10 - Veto sustained (0-140)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Providing that the motor vehicle excise tax and certificate of title fee may not be imposed on the issuance of a certificate of title for specified vehicles transferred without consideration if the vehicle is transferred in a specified manner to or from specified trusts; altering the definition of "consideration"; defining "vehicle"; etc.
Title
Estates and Trusts - Vehicle Transfers - Excise Tax and Fee Exemption
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-03 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-28 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (138-0) (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-28 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (138-0) (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-10 | House | Veto sustained (0-140) |
2017-05-26 | House | Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative) |
2017-04-10 | House | Returned Passed |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2017-04-07 | Senate | Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Rereferred to Budget and Taxation |
2017-04-05 | Senate | First Reading Senate Rules |
2017-04-04 | House | Third Reading Passed (138-0) |
2017-03-31 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2017-03-31 | House | Favorable with Amendments {226889/1 Report Adopted |
2017-03-31 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations |
2018-02-22 | House | Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-02-10 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations |
Subjects
Beneficiaries
Estates and Trusts
Excise Tax
Exemptions
Fees
Motor Vehicles
Motorcycles, Mopeds and Motor Scooters
Sales and Use Tax
Taxes - Transportation
Titles
Transportation - Generally
Estates and Trusts
Excise Tax
Exemptions
Fees
Motor Vehicles
Motorcycles, Mopeds and Motor Scooters
Sales and Use Tax
Taxes - Transportation
Titles
Transportation - Generally