MD HB1351 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 11 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-15 - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 11 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-15 - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing the Secretary of Health, with the consent of a unit of local government, to delegate to the unit of local government the authority to inspect and to conduct site visits and full surveys of related institutions and nursing homes; and requiring related institutions and nursing homes to report certain information to a unit of local government if the Secretary has delegated inspection authority.
Title
Health Facilities - Delegation of Inspection Authority - Related Institutions and Nursing Homes
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-15 | House | Withdrawn by Sponsor |
2022-02-24 | House | Hearing canceled |
2022-02-14 | House | Hearing 3/03 at 1:30 p.m. |
2022-02-11 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations |
Subjects
Health Care Facilities
Health Care Facilities and Regulation
Health, Department of
Inspections
Nursing Homes
Reports
Health Care Facilities and Regulation
Health, Department of
Inspections
Nursing Homes
Reports
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Health - General | 19 | 1406 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Health - General | 19 | 1408 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Health - General | 19 | 1413.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Health - General | 19 | 1414 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Health - General | 19 | 304 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Health - General | 19 | 308 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |