MD HB135 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-01 - Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m. (Environment and Transportation)
Pending: House Environment and Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-01 - Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m. (Environment and Transportation)
Pending: House Environment and Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Repealing a prohibition on pedestrians using a highway of the Maryland Transportation Authority; altering a prohibition on bicycles using an Authority highway; requiring the Authority to construct separated or buffered bicycle ways and pedestrian walkways in certain locations under certain circumstances; providing for a waiver from requirements under the Act; requiring the Bicycle and Pedestrian Advisory Committee to review waiver requests under the Act and provide recommendations to the Secretary of Transportation; etc.
Title
Transportation - Maryland Transportation Authority - Pedestrian and Bicycle Safety and Accessibility
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-01 | House | Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m. (Environment and Transportation) |
2024-01-10 | House | First Reading Environment and Transportation and Appropriations |
2023-10-13 | House | Pre-filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB593 (Crossfiled) 2024-01-31 - Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Subjects
Accessibility - see also- Blind; Deaf; DevDisPer; PhysDisPer
Administrative Agencies
Awareness and Outreach
Bicycles
Bridges and Tunnels
Committees and Commissions
Construction
Governor
Highways
Pedestrians
Reports
Revenue and Taxes
Safety
Sidewalks
State Highway Administration
Traffic Regulation
Transportation
Transportation - Highways
Transportation, Department of
Waivers
Work, Labor, and Employment
Administrative Agencies
Awareness and Outreach
Bicycles
Bridges and Tunnels
Committees and Commissions
Construction
Governor
Highways
Pedestrians
Reports
Revenue and Taxes
Safety
Sidewalks
State Highway Administration
Traffic Regulation
Transportation
Transportation - Highways
Transportation, Department of
Waivers
Work, Labor, and Employment
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Transportation | 2 | 606 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Transportation | 21 | 1401 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Transportation | 21 | 1405 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Maryland State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Legislation/Details/HB0135?ys=2024RS |
Text | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2024RS/bills/hb/hb0135f.pdf |