MD HB1347 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB1150
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Introduced on February 11 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-15 - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 11 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-15 - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Altering a provision of law that prohibits a parent or guardian from being required to present a certain certificate of immunization under certain circumstances to be admitted to school to apply only to public schools; requiring the Secretary of Health to include an exclusion for certain individuals when exercising certain authority; and prohibiting an individual from being required to provide certain proof to obtain employment, to travel, or to access a public facility.
Title
Authority of the Secretary of Health and Medical Information
Sponsors
Del. Dan Cox [R] | Del. Joseph Boteler [R] | Del. Susan McComas [R] | Del. April Rose [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-15 | House | Withdrawn by Sponsor |
2022-03-09 | House | Hearing canceled |
2022-02-17 | House | Hearing 3/14 at 2:00 p.m. |
2022-02-11 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations |
Same As/Similar To
HB1150 (Carry Over) 2021-02-12 - Hearing 3/17 at 1:30 p.m.
Subjects
Certifications
Evidence
Health, Department of
Immunization
Parents and Guardians
Public Buildings and Facilities
Public Health
Public Schools
Records
Vulnerable Adults
Work, Labor, and Employment
Evidence
Health, Department of
Immunization
Parents and Guardians
Public Buildings and Facilities
Public Health
Public Schools
Records
Vulnerable Adults
Work, Labor, and Employment
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Education | 7 | 403 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Health - General | 18 | 901.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Health - General | 18 | 902 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Health - General | 18 | 903 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Health - General | 18 | 904 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Health - General | 18 | 905 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Health - General | 18 | 906 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Health - General | 20 | 2201 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |