MD HB1340 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on May 12 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-12 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 283
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on May 12 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-12 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 283
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Altering the membership and appointment of the board of directors of a district corporation in Montgomery County; altering the procedures by which certain persons may apply to establish a district corporation or expand the geographic area of a district; limiting the imposition of a certain tax to certain owners of nonexempt property within a district; applying the Act retroactively; etc.
Title
Montgomery County - Economic Development - Business Improvement Districts MC 08-22
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2022-04-06 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-17 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-03-17 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-12 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 283 |
2022-04-07 | House | Returned Passed |
2022-04-06 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2022-04-05 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2022-04-05 | Senate | Favorable Adopted |
2022-04-04 | Senate | Favorable Report by Finance |
2022-03-22 | Senate | Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m. |
2022-03-17 | Senate | Referred Finance |
2022-03-17 | House | Third Reading Passed (137-0) |
2022-03-16 | House | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2022-03-16 | House | Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation |
2022-02-17 | House | Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m. |
2022-02-11 | House | First Reading Environment and Transportation |
Subjects
Boundaries
Commerce and Business
Commercial Property
Committees and Commissions
Corporations
Economic Development
Hearings
Local Government - Generally
Montgomery County
Property Tax
Taxes - Miscellaneous - Local
Commerce and Business
Commercial Property
Committees and Commissions
Corporations
Economic Development
Hearings
Local Government - Generally
Montgomery County
Property Tax
Taxes - Miscellaneous - Local
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Economic Development | 12 | 601 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Economic Development | 12 | 605 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Economic Development | 12 | 608 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Economic Development | 12 | 609 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Economic Development | 12 | 610 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Economic Development | 12 | 611 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Economic Development | 12 | 612 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |