MD HB1340 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 25 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-30 - Hearing 4/6 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 25 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-30 - Hearing 4/6 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring an electric or gas distribution utility, on written request of a specified competitive supplier, to provide specified information about customer accounts to the supplier, subject to a restriction; requiring the distribution utility to provide the information in a specified form and to update it periodically; authorizing a customer to refuse authorization to share specified information; requiring a distribution utility to notify a specified supplier when specified authorization is withdrawn; etc.
Title
Electric Companies and Gas Companies - Customer Account Information
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-30 | Hearing 4/6 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2010-03-27 | First Reading Finance | |
2010-03-25 | Third Reading Passed (138-1) | |
2010-03-24 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2010-03-24 | Floor Amendment (Delegate Carr) Adopted | |
2010-03-23 | Special Order next session (Delegate Carr) Adopted | |
2010-03-23 | Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted | |
2010-03-26 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters | |
2010-02-18 | Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2010-02-18 | First Reading Economic Matters |
Subjects
Advertising
Consumer Protection
Disclosure
Electronic Commerce
Fees
Notices
Privacy
Public Service Commission
Records
Utilities
Consumer Protection
Disclosure
Electronic Commerce
Fees
Notices
Privacy
Public Service Commission
Records
Utilities