MD HB1330 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on April 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-18 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 38
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on April 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-18 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 38
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Renaming the State Law Library to be the Thurgood Marshall State Law Library; providing that the Thurgood Marshall State Law Library is the successor of the State Law Library; providing that certain names and titles of a certain unit and officials in laws and other documents mean the names and titles of the successor unit and officials; providing for the continuity of certain matters and persons; etc.
Title
State Law Library - Renaming
Sponsors
Sen. Ron Watson [D] | Del. Darryl Barnes [D] | Del. Erek Barron [D] | Del. Debra Davis [D] |
Sen. Michael Jackson [D] | Del. Jheanelle Wilkins [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-03-27 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-13 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (139-0) (Y: 140 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-03-13 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (139-0) (Y: 140 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-18 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 38 |
2019-04-03 | House | Returned Passed |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2019-04-01 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2019-04-01 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2019-04-01 | Senate | Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2019-03-18 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
2019-03-18 | House | Third Reading Passed (139-0) |
2019-03-15 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2019-03-15 | House | Favorable with Amendments {282414/1 Report Adopted |
2019-03-15 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary |
2019-02-26 | House | Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-02-22 | House | Rereferred to Judiciary |
2019-02-15 | House | First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations |
Subjects
Administrative Office of the Courts
Annotated Code of Maryland
Courts and Court Personnel - Statewide
Legislative Services, Department of
Libraries
Names
Publications
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials
Annotated Code of Maryland
Courts and Court Personnel - Statewide
Legislative Services, Department of
Libraries
Names
Publications
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials