MD HB1328 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on April 9 2021 - 75% progression
Action: 2021-04-09 - Returned Passed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Authorizing a county or municipal corporation to adopt certain policies to advance progress of infrastructure, equipment, and systems needed to extend broadband access to underserved areas; requiring the Department of Transportation and units of local government to allow joint trenching by broadband providers in a certain manner under certain circumstances; exempting counties and municipal corporations within the jurisdiction of the Washington Suburban Sanitary District from certain requirements; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Economic Development – Broadband Providers – Joint Trenching and Fee (Building Out Broadband Act of 2021)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-09 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-01 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 107 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-09HouseReturned Passed
2021-04-09SenateThird Reading Passed (47-0)
2021-04-08SenateSecond Reading Passed
2021-04-08SenateFavorable Adopted
2021-04-08SenateFavorable Report by Finance
2021-04-07SenateRereferred to Finance
2021-04-02SenateReferred Rules
2021-04-01HouseThird Reading Passed (107-28)
2021-04-01HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2021-04-01HouseFavorable with Amendments {913598/1 Adopted
2021-04-01HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
2021-02-08HouseHearing 3/04 at 1:30 p.m.
2021-02-08HouseFirst Reading Economic Matters

Same As/Similar To

SB824 (Crossfiled) 2021-04-08 - Passed Enrolled

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Economic Development13504(n/a)See Bill Text
Economic Development51101(n/a)See Bill Text
Economic Development51102(n/a)See Bill Text
Economic Development51103(n/a)See Bill Text
Transportation8654(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback