MD SB824 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum:
Status: Enrolled on April 8 2021 - 75% progression
Action: 2021-04-08 - Passed Enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Authorizing a county or municipal corporation to adopt certain policies to advance progress of infrastructure, equipment, and systems needed to extend certain broadband access to underserved areas; requiring the Department of Transportation and units of local government to allow joint trenching by broadband providers under certain circumstances; exempting counties and municipal corporations within the jurisdiction of the Washington Suburban Sanitary District from certain requirements; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Economic Development - Broadband Providers - Joint Trenching and Fee (Building Out Broadband Act of 2021)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-08 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-07 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 118 N: 18 NV: 3 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-19 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-08SenatePassed Enrolled
2021-04-08SenateThird Reading Passed (47-0)
2021-04-08SenateSenate Concurs House Amendments
2021-04-07HouseThird Reading Passed (118-18)
2021-04-05HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2021-04-05HouseFavorable with Amendments {503193/1 Adopted
2021-04-05HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
2021-03-20HouseReferred Economic Matters
2021-03-19SenateThird Reading Passed (45-0)
2021-03-19SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2021-03-19SenateFavorable with Amendments {337071/1 Adopted
2021-03-19SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Finance
2021-02-10SenateHearing 3/16 at 1:00 p.m.
2021-02-09SenateFirst Reading Finance

Same As/Similar To

HB1328 (Crossfiled) 2021-04-09 - Returned Passed

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Economic Development51101(n/a)See Bill Text
Economic Development51103(n/a)See Bill Text
Transportation8654(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback