MD HB1319 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB1244
Note: Carry Over of previous HB880
Note: Carry Over of previous HB880
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 8 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-11 - Hearing 3/11 at 1:30 p.m.
Pending: House Health and Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 8 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-11 - Hearing 3/11 at 1:30 p.m.
Pending: House Health and Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring certain insurers, nonprofit health service plans, and health maintenance organizations to provide coverage for certain long-term antibiotic treatment of Lyme disease and related tick-borne illnesses under certain circumstances; prohibiting an entity subject to the Act from denying certain treatment under certain circumstances; providing that the Act applies to all policies, contracts, and health benefit plans issued, delivered, or renewed in the State on or after January 1, 2022; etc.
Title
Health Insurance - Lyme Disease and Related Tick-Borne Illnesses - Long-Term Antibiotic Treatment
Sponsors
Del. Seth Howard [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-11 | House | Hearing 3/11 at 1:30 p.m. |
2021-02-08 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations |
Same As/Similar To
HB1319 (Carry Over) 2021-02-11 - Hearing 3/11 at 1:30 p.m.
HB880 (Carry Over) 2018-04-07 - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
HB880 (Carry Over) 2018-04-07 - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Subjects
Diseases
Drugs
Health
Health Insurance
Health Maintenance Organizations
Health Occupations
Insects
Insurance - Health
Medical Conditions
Medical Treatments
Nonprofit Organizations
Physicians
Safety
Time
Drugs
Health
Health Insurance
Health Maintenance Organizations
Health Occupations
Insects
Insurance - Health
Medical Conditions
Medical Treatments
Nonprofit Organizations
Physicians
Safety
Time
Code Citations
Maryland State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Legislation/Details/HB1319?ys=2021RS |
Text | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2021RS/bills/hb/hb1319f.pdf |