MD HB1315 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-13 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 455
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-13 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 455
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Altering the locations of the Cyber Warrior Diversity Program in the State to include the University of Maryland Baltimore County Training Centers that are located in the State; specifying the amounts and uses of certain grants provided under the Program; altering the date from November 1, 2018 to on or before December 15, 2019, and each December 15 thereafter, that the governing entities must notify the Maryland Higher Education Commission regarding the number of students enrolled in the Program for the academic year; etc.
Title
Higher Education - Cyber Warrior Diversity Program - Revisions
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-02 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (138-0) (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (138-0) (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-13 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 455 |
2019-04-08 | House | Returned Passed |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2019-04-04 | Senate | First Reading Senate Rules |
2019-04-03 | House | Third Reading Passed (138-0) |
2019-04-02 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2019-04-02 | House | Favorable with Amendments {394062/1 Report Adopted |
2019-04-02 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations |
2019-03-12 | House | Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-03-08 | House | Rereferred to Appropriations |
2019-02-15 | House | First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations |
Subjects
Apprentices
Appropriations
Baltimore County
Budgets
Certifications
Commerce and Business
Commercial Rehabilitation
Community Colleges
Community Development
Contracts
Curriculum
Cybersecurity
Education
Enterprise Zones
Governor
Grants
Higher Education
Higher Education Commission
Industry and Technology
Job Training
Minorities
Open Government
Revenue and Taxes
School Testing
Small Business
State Universities and Colleges
Students
Telecommunications and Information Technology
Urban Renewal
Appropriations
Baltimore County
Budgets
Certifications
Commerce and Business
Commercial Rehabilitation
Community Colleges
Community Development
Contracts
Curriculum
Cybersecurity
Education
Enterprise Zones
Governor
Grants
Higher Education
Higher Education Commission
Industry and Technology
Job Training
Minorities
Open Government
Revenue and Taxes
School Testing
Small Business
State Universities and Colleges
Students
Telecommunications and Information Technology
Urban Renewal