MD HB1315 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 9 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-12 - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 9 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-12 - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Specifying that a certain expense allowance to which a Carroll County Commissioner is entitled may not be more than a certain amount; specifying that a County Commissioner is entitled to participate in the same benefits program that is available to general county employees; specifying that a former County Commissioner is entitled to participate in the same health benefits program that is available to former general county employees; and making the Act an emergency measure.
Title
Carroll County - County Commissioners - Allowance and Benefits
Sponsors
Del. Susan Krebs [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-12 | House | Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn |
2018-03-05 | House | Hearing canceled |
2018-03-13 | House | Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-02-09 | House | First Reading Environment and Transportation |
Subjects
Carroll County
Counties - Local Laws
County Commissioners
Emergency Bills
Retirement Systems
Salaries and Compensation
Counties - Local Laws
County Commissioners
Emergency Bills
Retirement Systems
Salaries and Compensation