MD HB1310 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 15 2024 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-03-18 - Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Judicial Proceedings Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 15 2024 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-03-18 - Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Judicial Proceedings Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing the Baltimore City Coordinated Youth Violence Review and Response Team to examine and prevent violence against youth through intensive case management; requiring that the review team be provided with access to certain information and records; establishing certain closed meeting, confidentiality, and disclosure requirements for certain information and records; authorizing police records concerning a child to be divulged to the review and response team; etc.
Title
Baltimore City Coordinated Youth Violence Review and Response Team
Sponsors
Sen. Dalya Attar [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-03-15 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 134 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-18 | Senate | Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m. |
2024-03-18 | Senate | Referred Judicial Proceedings |
2024-03-15 | House | Third Reading Passed (134-0) |
2024-03-14 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2024-03-14 | House | Favorable with Amendments {903425/1 Adopted |
2024-03-14 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary |
2024-02-10 | House | Hearing 2/29 at 1:00 p.m. |
2024-02-09 | House | First Reading Judiciary |
Subjects
Administrative Agencies
Baltimore City
Children
Civil Actions
Committees and Commissions
Contracts
Counties - Local Laws
Crimes and Punishments
Cybersecurity
Data
Death
Disclosure
Evidence
Forms
Guns
Health
Identification
Information Technology - Generally
kinship
Law Enforcement
Local Government Mandates
Medical Examiners
Mental and Behavioral Health
Notices
Open Government
Parents and Guardians
Parole and Probation
Penalties and Sentences
Privacy
Public Information
Records
Reports
Safety
Social Services
Students
Subpoenas
Substance Abuse Treatment
Trials
Violence
Vital Records
Witnesses
Youth
Baltimore City
Children
Civil Actions
Committees and Commissions
Contracts
Counties - Local Laws
Crimes and Punishments
Cybersecurity
Data
Death
Disclosure
Evidence
Forms
Guns
Health
Identification
Information Technology - Generally
kinship
Law Enforcement
Local Government Mandates
Medical Examiners
Mental and Behavioral Health
Notices
Open Government
Parents and Guardians
Parole and Probation
Penalties and Sentences
Privacy
Public Information
Records
Reports
Safety
Social Services
Students
Subpoenas
Substance Abuse Treatment
Trials
Violence
Vital Records
Witnesses
Youth
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Courts and Judicial Proceedings | 3 | 8A-27 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Local Government | 31 | 101 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Local Government | 31 | 111 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |