MD HB1309 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 4 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-04-07 - Rereferred to Finance
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 4 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-04-07 - Rereferred to Finance
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Exempting specified positions in the Department of Health and Mental Hygiene from a provision of law that prohibits specified appointing authorities in State government from inquiring into the criminal record or criminal history of an applicant for employment until the applicant has been provided an opportunity for an interview.
Title
State Personnel - Applicants for Employment - Criminal History Records Check - Exemptions
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-28 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (137-0) (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-07 | Senate | Rereferred to Finance |
2014-04-05 | Senate | First Reading Senate Rules |
2014-04-04 | House | Third Reading Passed (137-0) |
2014-04-03 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2014-04-03 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2014-04-03 | House | Favorable Report by Appropriations |
2014-03-06 | House | Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-02-20 | House | Hearing cancelled |
2014-03-04 | House | Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-02-07 | House | First Reading Appropriations |
Subjects
Criminal Background Investigations
Health and Mental Hygiene, Department of
Mental Health
State Employees
State Government - Personnel
Work, Labor and Employment
Health and Mental Hygiene, Department of
Mental Health
State Employees
State Government - Personnel
Work, Labor and Employment