MD HB1300 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 16 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-16 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 473
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 16 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-16 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 473
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Exempting the repair, renovation, reconstruction, and limited expansion of certain existing structures in the Beach Erosion Control District from a certain prohibition, under certain circumstances and subject to certain requirements; and repealing certain exemptions from a certain prohibition for the widening of the boardwalk in Ocean City and the construction of certain restroom facilities in the District.
Title
Beach Erosion Control District - State- and City-Owned Structures
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-11 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 131 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2022-04-09 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-03-21 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 133 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2022-04-09 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-03-21 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 133 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-16 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 473 |
2022-04-11 | House | Passed Enrolled |
2022-04-11 | House | Third Reading Passed (131-0) |
2022-04-11 | House | House Concurs Senate Amendments |
2022-04-09 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (44-0) |
2022-04-07 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2022-04-07 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {133326/1 Adopted |
2022-04-07 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2022-03-21 | Senate | Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2022-03-21 | House | Third Reading Passed (133-0) |
2022-03-21 | House | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2022-03-21 | House | Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation |
2022-03-09 | House | Hearing 3/09 at 2:15 p.m. |
2022-03-09 | House | Hearing canceled |
2022-03-09 | House | Hearing 3/09 at 1:25 p.m. |
2022-03-09 | House | Hearing canceled |
2022-02-14 | House | Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m. |
2022-02-11 | House | First Reading Environment and Transportation |
Subjects
Boundaries
Construction
Disabilities
Erosion
Natural Resources - Generally
Ocean City
Public Buildings and Facilities
Real Property
Shore Erosion
Weights and Measures
Construction
Disabilities
Erosion
Natural Resources - Generally
Ocean City
Public Buildings and Facilities
Real Property
Shore Erosion
Weights and Measures
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Natural Resources | 8 | 1102 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |