MD HB1300 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 19 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-31 - Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Budget and Taxation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 19 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-31 - Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Budget and Taxation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing the Task Force to Study Long-Term Care Insurance Premiums; providing that the purpose of the Task Force is to study long term care insurance enrollment in the State and consider methods to increase enrollment in long-term care insurance; requiring the Task Force to report its findings and proposed legislation to address enrollment in long-term care insurance to the Governor and the General Assembly on or before December 31, 2016; etc.
Title
Task Force to Study Long-Term Care Insurance Premiums
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-03-17 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (134-1) (Y: 134 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-31 | Senate | Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m. |
2016-03-21 | Senate | First Reading Budget and Taxation |
2016-03-19 | House | Third Reading Passed (134-1) |
2016-03-18 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2016-03-18 | House | Favorable with Amendments {795763/1 Report Adopted |
2016-03-18 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means |
2016-03-14 | House | Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m. |
2016-02-12 | House | First Reading Ways and Means |
Subjects
Aging, Department of
Committees and Commissions
Health Insurance
Income Tax
Insurance
Insurance Administration
Long-Term Care
Prices
Reports
Sunset
Tax Credits
Taxes - Income
Committees and Commissions
Health Insurance
Income Tax
Insurance
Insurance Administration
Long-Term Care
Prices
Reports
Sunset
Tax Credits
Taxes - Income