MD HB1293 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 14 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-15 - Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Pending: Senate Education Health and Environmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 14 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-15 - Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Pending: Senate Education Health and Environmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Providing that an application for a certain license renewal is not complete without a certain affidavit; extending in Baltimore City the time during which the Board of License Commissioners may issue a Class A-7 license; altering the hours of operation for a holder of a Class A-7 license; requiring the holder of a Class A license, Class A-2 license, or Class A-7 license to install and operate a digital surveillance system on the licensed premises in accordance with regulations that the Board adopts; etc.
Title
Baltimore City – Alcoholic Beverages – Class A, A–2, and A–7 Licenses – Surveillance System
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-14 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 131 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-15 | Senate | Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2020-03-14 | House | Third Reading Passed (131-0) |
2020-03-12 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2020-03-12 | House | Favorable with Amendments {113094/1 Adopted |
2020-03-11 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters |
2020-02-10 | House | Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-02-07 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |
Same As/Similar To
SB69 (Crossfiled) 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 510
Subjects
Alcoholic Beverages - By Subdivision
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills
Alcoholic Beverages Licenses
Baltimore City
Electronic Surveillance
Equipment
Law Enforcement
License Commissioners, Boards of
Local Government Mandates
Time
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills
Alcoholic Beverages Licenses
Baltimore City
Electronic Surveillance
Equipment
Law Enforcement
License Commissioners, Boards of
Local Government Mandates
Time
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Alcoholic Beverages | 12 | 102 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Alcoholic Beverages | 12 | 1407 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Alcoholic Beverages | 12 | 1804.2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Alcoholic Beverages | 12 | 902.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |