MD HB1285 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 18 2024 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-03-18 - Referred Finance
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 18 2024 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-03-18 - Referred Finance
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing licensed social workers to register as a rehabilitation practitioner; and authorizing a licensed certified social worker-clinical to provide evaluation services for workers' compensation claims related to permanent impairments involving a behavioral or mental disorder.
Title
Workers' Compensation - Rehabilitation Practitioners - Licensed Social Workers
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-18 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-18 | Senate | Referred Finance |
2024-03-18 | House | Third Reading Passed (137-0) |
2024-03-16 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2024-03-16 | House | Favorable with Amendments {573527/1 Adopted |
2024-03-16 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters |
2024-02-09 | House | Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m. |
2024-02-09 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |
Same As/Similar To
SB931 (Crossfiled) 2024-02-06 - Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Subjects
Certifications
Claims
Committees and Commissions
Developmentally Disabled Persons
Education
Job Training
Licenses
Mental and Behavioral Health
Registration
Social Workers
Vocational Rehabilitation
Workers' Compensation
Claims
Committees and Commissions
Developmentally Disabled Persons
Education
Job Training
Licenses
Mental and Behavioral Health
Registration
Social Workers
Vocational Rehabilitation
Workers' Compensation
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Labor and Employment | 9 | 6A-01 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Labor and Employment | 9 | 6A-04 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Labor and Employment | 9 | 6A-09 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Labor and Employment | 9 | 721 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |