MD HB128 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 1 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-01 - Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 1 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-01 - Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring a public service company that is going to terminate electric or gas service to a customer who resides in a multifamily dwelling unit to notify the property owner or property manager of the multifamily dwelling unit before terminating service to the customer; requiring a public service company to provide the notice only to a property owner or property manager who enrolls in a specified service termination notification program; etc.
Title
Public Utilities - Termination of Service to Multifamily Dwelling Unit - Notification to Property Owner or Manager
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-03-01 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (125-13) (Y: 125 N: 13 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-01 | Senate | Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn |
2016-03-29 | Senate | Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m. |
2016-03-02 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
2016-03-01 | House | Third Reading Passed (125-13) |
2016-02-26 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2016-02-26 | House | Floor Amendment (Delegate Long) {593327/1 Adopted |
2016-02-25 | House | Special Order until 02/26 (Delegate Jameson) Adopted |
2016-02-25 | House | Floor Amendment (Delegate Long) {593327/1 |
2016-02-24 | House | Special Order until 2/25 (Delegate Long) Adopted |
2016-02-24 | House | Favorable with Amendments {183095/1 Report Adopted |
2016-02-23 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters |
2016-01-28 | House | Hearing 1/28 at 1:00 p.m. |
2016-01-20 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |
Subjects
Apartments
Condominiums
Consumer Protection
Housing
Notices
Public Service Commission
Real Property
Rules and Regulations
Utilities
Utility Regulation
Condominiums
Consumer Protection
Housing
Notices
Public Service Commission
Real Property
Rules and Regulations
Utilities
Utility Regulation