MD HB1279 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 9 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-09 - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 9 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-09 - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing the creation of a State Debt not to exceed $2,000,000, the proceeds to be used as a grant to the Board of Directors of The Olney Theatre Center for the Arts, Inc. for the acquisition, planning, design, construction, repair, renovation, reconstruction, site improvement, and capital equipping of the Olney Theatre Center, located in Montgomery County; providing for disbursement of the loan proceeds, subject to a requirement that the grantee provide and expend a matching fund; etc.
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Montgomery County - Olney Theatre Center for the Arts
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-09 | House | Unfavorable Report by Appropriations |
2018-03-10 | House | Hearing 3/10 at 5:00 p.m. |
2018-03-01 | House | Hearing canceled |
2018-03-10 | House | Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-02-09 | House | First Reading Appropriations |
Subjects
Art, Music and Cultural Affairs
Community Facilities and Services
Montgomery County
State Bonds
State Debt (Bond Bills)
Theaters
Community Facilities and Services
Montgomery County
State Bonds
State Debt (Bond Bills)
Theaters