MD HB1267 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 13 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-21 - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 13 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-21 - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the Office of Student Financial Assistance in the Maryland Higher Education Commission to post on its Web site and to make available the names and addresses of each recipient of a Senatorial or Delegate scholarship and the name of the legislator who made each award and the number of the legislator's district; etc.
Title
Senatorial and Delegate Scholarships - Posting of Award Recipients
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-21 | Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means Withdrawn | |
2012-03-19 | Hearing cancelled | |
2012-03-02 | Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2012-02-27 | Re-referred Ways and Means | |
2012-02-13 | First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations |
Subjects
Electronic Government
General Assembly
Higher Education Commission
Public Information
Scholarships and Student Financial Aid
Students
General Assembly
Higher Education Commission
Public Information
Scholarships and Student Financial Aid
Students
Maryland State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Search/Legislation?target=/2012rs/billfile/HB1267.htm |
Text | http://mlis.state.md.us/2012rs/bills/hb/hb1267f.pdf |