MD HB1251 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on February 8 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-04-08 - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Altering the matters for which certain employee organizations representing certain Baltimore City police officers or the City of Baltimore may request arbitration; repealing certain provisions limiting the matters that may be arbitrated and prohibiting the board of arbitration from providing for certain issues; requiring the adoption of certain financial terms of employment and certain terms of employment; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Baltimore City - Police Department - Collective Bargaining and Arbitration

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-08HouseUnfavorable Report by Appropriations
2019-02-14HouseHearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-02-14HouseHearing canceled
2019-02-11HouseHearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-02-08HouseFirst Reading Appropriations

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback