MD HB1248 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-6)
Status: Engrossed on March 13 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-03-14 - First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Pending: Senate Judicial Proceedings Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Prohibiting a physician, qualified health care provider, and hospital from including a narrative describing the alleged offense or a photograph of the victim in any request to obtain payment for certain services related to sexual assault forensic examinations for certain sexually related crimes under certain circumstances; altering the services for which the Criminal Injuries Compensation Board is required to pay certain claims and for which a physician and a qualified health care provider are immune from civil liability; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Criminal Procedure - Sexual Assault Evidence Kits - Privacy and Reimbursement

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-10 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (138-0) (Y: 139 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 7) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-14SenateFirst Reading Judicial Proceedings
2019-03-13HouseThird Reading Passed (138-0)
2019-03-12HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2019-03-12HouseFavorable with Amendments {786989/1 Report Adopted
2019-03-11HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
2019-02-18HouseHearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-02-13HouseHearing canceled
2019-02-11HouseHearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-02-08HouseFirst Reading Health and Government Operations

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback